This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 01/16/2021 at 03:10:32 (UTC).

Gordon v. Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Gordon filed an Other lawsuit against Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kolakowski, Victoria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0916

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kolakowski, Victoria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Kristen Gordon

Respondent and Defendant

Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Matthew Gutierrez

Attorney at Gutierrez Derham Law Firm LLP

26459 Rancho Pkwy S Ste 1

Lake Forest, CA 92630

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Steven B. Katz

2029 Century Park East, Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Naveen Kabir

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete LLP

2029 Century Park E Ste 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2912

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final filed in superior court on 12/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: AOB to 12/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's notice of appeal was received by the Alameda County Superior Court on or before May 10, 2020, before the deadline of June 15, and will be deemed timely filed. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.25(b)(1) ["A document is deemed filed on the date the clerk receives it."]; Eisenberg et al., Cal. Practice Guide: Civil Appeals and Writs (The Rutter Group 2019) 3:133 ["So long as received by the clerk's office before expiration of the appeal deadline, the notice is timely 'filed' . . . regardless of when the notice is officially stamped as 'filed.' "].) Accordingly, respondent's motion to dismiss the appeal is DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply Re: Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal (opposed; filed w/permission)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to opposition to file reply to motion to dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Appellant Kristen Gordon's Opposition to Respondent Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Reply Re Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Reply to Motion to Dismiss (to court for permission to file)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kristen GordonAttorney: Matthew Gutierrez; Notes: Matthew Gutierrez, attorney for appellant, w/copy of judgment attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Respondent (attached to motion to dismiss)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (after record).; Notes: Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: responsive filing fee paid through TrueFiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 08/21/2020. Designating 8.124 without RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 07/14/2020 by Counsel for Plaintiff Kristen Gordon appealing order from 01/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19034039; Trial Court Judge: Kolakowski, Victoria

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE & SPIRITS LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTIERREZ MATTHEW