This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/24/2021 at 02:54:30 (UTC).

Google LLC v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Google LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9451

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Google LLC

Respondent

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

191 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Interested Parties

Abdullah Uzair

Angel Chavez

Nicholas Joel Luskin

Salvador De La O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Amit Q. Gressel

Attorney at Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich, & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Jordan A. Nelson

Attorney at Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich, & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Victor Hao-Jan Jih

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

633 W 5Th St Ste 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3543

David H. Kramer

Attorney at Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Interested Party Attorneys

Laura Luo-Yao Ho

Attorney at Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian, & Ho

300 Lakeside Dr #1000

Oakland, CA 94612-3534

Polina Pecherskaya

Attorney at Hammondlaw, P.C.

1829 Reisterstown Rd. Suite 410

Baltimore, MD 21208

Ari Nathan Cherniak

Attorney at HammondLaw, P.C.

1829 Reisterstown Rd Ste 410

Baltimore, MD 21208-7118

Julian Ari Hammond

Attorney at Hammond Law, PC

1829 Reistertown Rd. Ste 410

Baltimore, MD 21208

James Paul Kan

Attorney at Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian, & Ho

300 Lakeside Dr Ste 1000

Oakland, CA 94612

Katharine Lindsay Fisher

Attorney at Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian, & Ho

300 Lakeside Dr Ste 1000

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of reply on all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition and exhibits on Respondent and Real Parties in Interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Real Parties in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Filed by Real Parties in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Volumes 1-7; Volume 6 is sealed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition and exhibits on superior court and real party in interest-Abdullah. No service on real parties in interest: Chavez, Luskin, De La O.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: ***SEALED*** Exhibit - Volume 1 of 7 Corrections needed: volume number on cover pages, additional bookmarks, descriptive texts in bookmarks, pagination to begin on cover pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Exhibits - Volume 6 of 7Corrections needed: volume number on cover pages, additional bookmarks, descriptive texts in bookmarks, pagination to begin on cover pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Prohibition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Polina Brandler