This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/02/2023 at 09:08:56 (UTC).

GONZALEZ v. S.C. (FRANCINI)

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 GONZALEZ filed an Other lawsuit against C FRANCINI. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7059

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ana Gonzalez

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Francini, Inc.

Parsoda USA, Inc.

M S International, Inc.

E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company

Forte-Stone, LLC

Terrazzo & Marble Supply Co. Of Illinois

Continental Stone Granite and Marble, Inc.

Walker Zanger, Inc.

Cambria Company LLC

C&C North America, Inc.

SMA Surfaces, Inc

Arizona Tile L.L.C.

Dal-Tile Distribution Inc.

Marble & Granite Supply of Illinois, Inc.

Stone Design, Inc.

Best-Way Marble & Tile Co., Inc.

Dente Trading Co. Inc.

Stone Source, LLC.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Raphael Metzger

Abraham E. Bran

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorneys

Deidre Cohen Katz

Roger Mohan Mansukhani

Andrew Thomas Mortl

John H. Shaffery

Wayne E. Beaudoin

Thomas Frederick Vandenburg

Philip R. Cosgrove

Patrick James Foley

Christine Dianne Calareso

Thomas Patrick Gmelich

Mark D. Sayre

Ann Marie Mortimer

Michael A. Graham

Jason Frederick Meyer

Other Attorneys

Rey S. Yang

Guy R. Gruppie

Jeffery J. Daar

9 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note: Mail returned and re-sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Corrigan, J., was recused and did not participate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Francini, Inc. Attorney: Deidre Cohen Katz Real Party in Interest: Parsoda USA, Inc. Attorney: Deidre Cohen Katz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Ana Gonzalez Attorney: Raphael Metzger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B323892; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV06984

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less