Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/01/2021 at 04:25:08 (UTC).

GONZALEZ v. COUNTY OF KERN

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 GONZALEZ filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against COUNTY OF KERN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3928

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Santos Gonzalez

Patricia Serna

Aracely Sanchez

Jose Sanchez

Defendant and Respondent

County of Kern

Not Yet Classified

Century Law Group, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Karen Ann Larson

Attorney at Century Law Group, LLP

5200 Century Boulevard, Suite 345

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Michael M. Hogan

Attorney at Hogan Law,APC

225 Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Andrew C. Thomson

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

1115 Truxtun Avenue, Fourth Floor

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Karen A. Larson

Attorney at Century Law Group, LLP

5200 West Century Boulevard, Suite 345

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Century Law Group, LLP Attorney: Karen A. Larson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F078306; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Kern County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-17-100040

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where County of Kern is a litigant