This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/27/2023 at 05:08:03 (UTC).

Golden Properties, LLC v. City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Golden Properties, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6790

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Golden Properties, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

City and County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

David Blackwell

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael J. Betz

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

Three Embarcadero Center - 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4074

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Andrea Ruiz-Esquide

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1 Dr. Carlton Goodlett Place - Room 234

San Francisco, CA 94102

Kristen Ann Jensen

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place City Hall, Room 234

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/15/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Golden Properties, LLC appealing judgment from 10/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CPF19516746

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less