This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/24/2021 at 03:50:04 (UTC).

Goldberg v. Sidley Austin, LLP et al.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Goldberg filed an Other lawsuit against Sidley Austin, LLP. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hogue, Amy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7487

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 5

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hogue, Amy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Michael Goldberg

S. Lee Terry, Jr.

Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP

Respondents and Defendants

Halloran & Sage, LLP

S. Lee Terry, Jr.

Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP

Robinson & Cole LLP

Shant Chalian

Brian Courtney

Neal Sullivan

Bailey Cavalieri LLC

Rome McGuigan, P.C.

Sidley Austin LLP

Thomas Geyer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Louis R. Miller

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brian Aaron Procel

Attorney at Miller Barondess, LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste. 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jennifer Mira Hashmall

Attorney at Miller Barondess, LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew Louis Schrader

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4632

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Michael P. McNamara

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Madeline Paige Skitzki

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2091

Kirsten Hicks Spira

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP,

633 W. 5Th St. Ste 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Alexander Michael Smith

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2091

Louis R. Miller

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brian Aaron Procel

Attorney at Miller Barondess, LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste. 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jennifer Mira Hashmall

Attorney at Miller Barondess, LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew Louis Schrader

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4632

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Edith Rae Matthai

Attorney at Robie & Matthai

350 South Grand Ave., Suite 3950

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2609

Michael P. McNamara

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Madeline Paige Skitzki

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2091

Kirsten Hicks Spira

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP,

633 W. 5Th St. Ste 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Alexander Michael Smith

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2091

Mark T. Drooks

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert et al

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2561

Sharon Ben-Shahar Mayer

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer et al. PC

1875 Century Park East, 23Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Amara Sarah Turzak

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

501 W Broadway Ste 600

San Diego, CA 92101-3584

Earll Moncrieff Pott

Attorney at Klinedinst, PC

501 W Broadway Ste 600

San Diego, CA 92101

Robert M. Shaughnessy

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K Street Suite 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Heather L. Rosing

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

501 W. Broadway Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

David C. Scheper

Attorney at Scheper Kim & Harris, LLP

800 West Sixthst. 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2701

Miranda Kling Lievsay

Attorney at Scheper Kim & Harris LLP

800 W 6Th St 18Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Michael Howard Swartz

Attorney at Scheper Kim & Harris LLP

800 W 6Th St, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Alexander Howard Cote

Attorney at Scheper Kim & Harris LLP

601 W. 5Th Street 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2025

Andrew A Servais

Attorney at Wingert Grebing Brubaker & Juskie, LLP

600 W Broadway Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101-3370

2 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: As to Shant Chalian, an individual, and Robinson & Cole LLP, only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/10/2021 By 61 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial Pursuant to the request to dismiss filed on February 2, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to appellant Michael Goldberg's February 2, 2021, request to dismiss the appeal, the appeal filed September 9, 2020, as to Respondents Shant Chalian, an individual; and Robinson & Cole LLP, only, is dismissed. The remittitur as to these parties only, shall issue forthwith (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Stipulation to extend the time to file the appellant's opening brief returned for non-compliance: did not include signatures from all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of appearance by Robert Shaughnessy of Klinedinst PC for Respondents Rome McGuigan PC and Brian Courtney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Request for dismissal of appeal (notice of appeal filed 9/9/2020) as to respondents Shant Chalian, an individual; and Robinson & Cole LLP only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (dated Feb. 28, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.; Notes: re September 9, 2020 appeal as to Shant Chalian and Robinson & Cole LLP only.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Appellant Goldberg's designation filed September 24, 2020 for notice of appeal September 9, 2020 (R3) - proceeding by appendix with reporter's transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Appellant Goldberg's designation filed September 24, 2020 - proceeding by appendix with reporter's transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Courtesy copy of Respondents' notice electing to use an appendix filed 9/16/2020 in trial court on behalf of respondents Robinson & Cole LLP and Shant Challian. "R2"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Sep 9, 2020 by Michael Goldberg as Trustee of the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust (R3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: -- DISMISSED MARCH 1, 2021 --Appeal filed Sep 9, 2020 by Michael Goldberg as Trustee of the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust (R2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Sep 9, 2020 by Michael Goldberg as Trustee of the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust (R1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Sep 9, 2020 by Michael Goldberg as Trustee of the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #D3747720 for $775 (Appeal Sep 1, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed Sep 1, 2020 by Michael Goldberg as Trustee of the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV42900; Trial Court Judge: Hogue, Amy

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sidley Austin LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Halloran & Sage, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smith, Alexander Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHRADER ANDREW LOUIS