This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/27/2023 at 05:07:10 (UTC).

Glendale Historical Society v. City of Glendale et al. **PREFERENCE CASE**

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 Glendale Historical Society filed an Other lawsuit against City of Glendale PREFERENCE CASE. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofton, Joel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6789

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lofton, Joel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Petitioner

Glendale Historical Society

Appellants and Defendants

City of Glendale

City Council of the City of Glendale

Interested Party

R & A Homes, LLC

Other

Public Resources Code section 21167.1 (CEQA).

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

Susan Lynne Brandt-Hawley

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Gillian VanMuyden

Interested Party Attorneys

Alicia Brooke Bartley

Lisa A. Weinberg

Other Attorneys

Consumer Law Section

Office of the District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and reply brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: ONE: reporter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Exempt gov code 6103

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: City of Glendale Attorney: Gillian VanMuyden Defendant and Appellant: City Council of the City of Glendale Attorney: Gillian VanMuyden

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: City of GlendaleAttorney: Gillian VanMuyden Defendant and Appellant: City Council of the City of GlendaleAttorney: Gillian VanMuyden

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice Designating Record filed on Feb 8, 2023; Record of Administrative Proceeding to be transmitted to this court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on Jan 30, 2023 by City of Glendale et al.**CEQA APPEAL**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCP01852; Trial Court Judge: Lofton, Joel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less