This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/11/2021 at 08:31:20 (UTC).

Givens v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Givens filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sotelo, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1557

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sotelo, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dermot Givens

Respondents

Hon. David Sotelo

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

WASSERMAN, COMDEN, CASSELMAN & PEARSON, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Armand Tinkerian

Attorney at Law Offices of Armand Tinkerian

135 South State College Blvd., Suite 200

Brea, CA 92821

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Allan Herzlich

Attorney at Herzlich & Blum LLP

27240 Turnberry Lane, Suite 200

Valencia, CA 91355

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Attorney for Petitioner - Dermot Givens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review and application for stay are denied. [S268533]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: * The petition for writ of mandate filed on April 9, 2021, has been read and considered along with the request for a stay. It is denied for failure to provide an adequate record. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1).) Petitioner failed to attach all peremptory challenges pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 170.6 filed by petitioner (or any party or attorney on petitioner's side) as well as the trial court's response thereto, including the court's response to petitioner's own July 9, 2007 challenge. Nor did petitioner provide a declaration explaining the circumstances making these documents unavailable. (Id., rule 8.486(b)(2).) Thus, petitioner has failed to show a prima facie case that the trial court abused its discretion in denying his second peremptory challenge to Judge David Sotelo.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 1 of 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASSERMAN COMDEN CASSELMAN & ESENSTEN is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZLICH ALLAN