This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/02/2022 at 05:06:53 (UTC).

Gipson v. Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Gipson filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Alameda. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Steckler, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5267

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Steckler, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

John Gipson

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robyn Harriet Fass Wang

1442A Walnut St. #229

Berkeley, CA 94709-1204

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Office of District Attorney

1225 Fallon Street - 9Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review and application for stay are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Petitioner (Cal. Supreme Court Case No. S275438)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The temporary stay imposed May 26, 2022 is dissolved, and the petition for writ of mandate is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The temporary stay imposed May 26, 2022 is dissolved, and the petition for writ of mandate is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to reply and exhibits to reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibit Nos. 1-2, to Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: Pending further consideration and disposition of the writ petition on file herein, proceedings in the above-captioned case are temporarily stayed. Real party in interest may serve and file points and authorities in informal opposition to the petition on or before June 9, 2022. Petitioner may serve and file informal reply points and authorities on or before June 16, 2022. The parties are hereby notified that, if circumstances warrant, the Court may issue a peremptory writ in the first instance. (See Code Civ. Proc. 1088; Palma v. U.S. Industrial Fasteners, Inc. (1984) 36 Cal.3d 171, 180.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service of writ petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: One volume of exhibits (filed without caption page)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or prohibition; requesting stay of May 27, 2022 hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Alameda is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant