Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/29/2021 at 11:41:36 (UTC).

GILERMAN v. S.C. (REDWOOD MORTGAGE INVESTORS VIII)

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 GILERMAN filed an Other lawsuit against C REDWOOD MORTGAGE INVESTORS VIII. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8828

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Erina Gilerman

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Redwood Mortgage Investors VIII

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Thomas D. Sands

Attorney at The Sands Law Group APLC

205 South Broadway, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Zshonette L. Reed

Attorney at Lorden & Reed

9909 Topanga Canyon Bouleavrd, Suite 247

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Katayoun Shakibi

Attorney at Wright Finlay & Zak, LLP

4665 Macarthur Court, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660-1811

Benjamin Rafael Levinson

Attorney at Attorney at Law

46 North Second Street, Suite A

Campbell, CA 95008-2026

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied; Notes: The petition for review and application for stay are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: Erina Gilerman Attorney: Zshonette L. Reed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311882; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV21196

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where REDWOOD MORTGAGE INVESTORS VIII A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAKIBI KATAYOUN