This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/14/2022 at 01:41:58 (UTC).

Gibson v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Gibson filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Riff, Lawrence. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1287

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Riff, Lawrence

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Karrie Gibson

Hacienda Heights, CA 91745

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Lawrence P. Riff

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

James Gibson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Ariel D. Carter

Attorney at CKB VIENNA LLP

10390 Commerce Center Drive Suite C-110

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Non-Operative Original Proceeding; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Non-Operative Writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Denied - extension of time.; Notes: The court has read and considered petitioner's request filed July 11, 2022 to extend the time within to file the response to the vexatious litigant notice. The request is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Petitioner's request for an extension of time to file response to vexatious litigant notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned.; Notes: Petitioner's mail regarding vexatious litigant notice returned marked "unclaimed."

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice re vexatious litigant (CCP 391.7) - Matter stayed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Request for immediate emergency petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARTER ARIEL D.