This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/06/2022 at 01:13:26 (UTC).

Giant Development, L.P. v. J.H. Fitzmaurice, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Giant Development, L P filed an Other lawsuit against J H Fitzmaurice, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weil, Edward. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3206

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Weil, Edward

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Giant Development, L.P.

Respondents and Defendants

J.H. Fitzmaurice, Inc.

Country Builders Inc.

Hkit Architects

Glass & Sash Inc.

Cross Defendants

Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc.

Basco Drywall & Painting, Co.

Carone & Compnay, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer Pui-Wah Tang

Attorney at Nomos LLP

1970 Broadway Ste 670

Oakland, CA 94612-2226

Garret David Murai

Attorney at Nomos LLP

1970 Broadway Suite 670

Oakland, CA 94612

John H. Patton

Attorney at Patton Sullivan Brodehl LLP

12647 Alcosta Blvd., Ste. 430

San Ramon, CA 94583

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Roy Mick Rubio

Attorney at Clausen Miller P.C.

100 Pine St Ste 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111-5235

Lawrence Si Zucker, II

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel, LLP

402 W Broadway Ste 1850

San Diego, CA 92101-3576

Michael Cullen Parme

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

402 W Broadway Suite 1850

San Diego, CA 92101

Ian Robert Feldman

Attorney at Clausen Miller P.C.

17901 Von Karman Ave Ste 650

Irvine, CA 92614

Jennifer Hammond Carroll

Attorney at Jacobsen & McElroy PC

2401 American River Dr Ste 100

Sacramento, CA 95825-7086

Robert Jack Buccieri

Attorney at VLP Law Group LLP

1534 Plaza Lane # 324

Burlingame, CA 94010

Karin Michelle Bruce

Attorney at Koeller Nebeker Carlson Haluck LLP

1478 Stone Point Dr Ste 400

Roseville, CA 95661-2876

Stephanie Liann Young

Attorney at Koeller Nebeker Carlson Haluck LLP

1478 Stone Point Dr Ste 400

Roseville, CA 95661

Jordan Allen Rodman

Attorney at Rodman & Associates PC.

149 Stony Cir Ste 210

Santa Rosa, CA 95401-4105

Megan Winter Wendell

Attorney at Rodman & Associates PC

149 Stony Cir Ste 210

Santa Rosa, CA 95401-4105

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Todd A. Fischer

Attorney at FISCHER KERNEY, LLP

2600 Garden Road, Suite 222

Monterey, CA 93940

Bryce Daniel Carroll

Attorney at Oles Morrison Rinker Baker LLP

492 9Th St Ste 220

Oakland, CA 94607-4055

Kevin P. McCarthy

Attorney at Oles Morrison Rinker & Baker LLP

492 Ninth Street Suite 220

Oakland, CA 94607

Andrew J Black

Attorney at O'Brien Law

225 S Lake Ave Ste M210

Pasadena, CA 91101-3666

Edward Joseph Riffle

Attorney at Collins & Collins

790 E. Colorado Blvd; Suite 600

Pasadena, CA 91101

Patrick Kevin O'Brien

Attorney at O'Brien Law, P.C.

755 Baywood Dr Ste 185

Petaluma, CA 94954-5509

Kathleen Cheatum Miller

Attorney at O'Brien Watters & Davis LLP

755 Baywood Drive Suite 185

Petaluma, CA 94954

3 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: RT - 1 Vol dated Sept. 16, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-5(e-filed), R-6(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record preparation inquiry follow-up due.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record preparation inquiry follow-up due.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Transmittal Sheet. RTs have been successfully transmitted to the Court of Appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Giant Development, L.P. Attorney: Garret David Murai

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement Received 8/13/21 Rejected 8/17/21 Missing order or judgement being appealed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 08/02/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Giant Development, L.P.Attorney: Garret David Murai Attorney: Jennifer Pui-Wah Tang Attorney: John H. Patton Attorney: Kevin R. Brodehl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Giant Development, L.P.Attorney: Garret David Murai

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appellant; check no. 16037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 02/16/2021. Designating CT with RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 02/05/2021 by Counsel for Plaintiff Giant Development, L.P. appealing judgment from 12/16/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: MSC1701059; Trial Court Judge: Weil, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glass & Sash Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Giant Development, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Country Builders Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where J.H. Fitzmaurice, Inc. is a litigant