This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/23/2022 at 00:06:09 (UTC).

Giambastiani v. Gordon

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Giambastiani filed an Other lawsuit against Gordon. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dollard, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3616

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dollard, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Debra Kay Giambastiani

Defendant and Respondent

Steve Gordon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Goodman

819 Eddy Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Hima Raviprakash

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor P. O. Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Steve Gordon Attorney: Hima Raviprakash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketBrief: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Due Date: 06/23/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Steve GordonAttorney: Hima Raviprakash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Steve GordonAttorney: Hima Raviprakash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/06/2022 By 61 Day(s) RB to 6-5-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Debra Kay Giambastiani Attorney: Peter Goodman One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 12/22/2021 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 03/04/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Steve GordonAttorney: Hima Raviprakash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Debra Kay GiambastianiAttorney: Peter Goodman; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 12/22/2021 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 03/04/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Appellant's unopposed motion to augment the record filed on December 23, 2021, is granted and the record on appeal is augmented to include those proceedings itemized within the motion, which is attached and incorporated by reference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Appellant's Motion to Augment Record on Appeal (augmentation attached to declaration)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Debra Kay Giambastiani Attorney: Peter Goodman Peter Goodman, attorney for Appellant Debra Kay Giambastiani, with copy of Judgment attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Debra Kay GiambastianiAttorney: Peter Goodman; Notes: Peter Goodman, attorney for Appellant Debra Kay Giambastiani, with copy of Judgment attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appellant; via credit card

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: dated 10/5/21; fees for RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 10/4/21; CT and RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: dated 10-1-21 - Failure to deposit $100 with Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 9-29-21 by Plaintiff Debra Kay Giambiastiani from judgment of 8-6-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sonoma County Superior Court - Main; County: Sonoma; Trial Court Case Number: SCV267137; Trial Court Judge: Dollard, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hima Raviprakash