This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/19/2021 at 22:21:18 (UTC).

G.G. v. The Superior Court of Tulare County

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 G G filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Tulare County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loza, Hugo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3210

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Loza, Hugo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

G. G.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Tulare County

Interested Party

Tulare Co. Health and Human Services Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Tulare County Counsel-Juvenile

Attorney at Tulare County Counsel

2900 W. Burrel Avenue

Visalia, CA 93291

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Petitioner did not submit a new juvenile writ petition (due date: 9/29/21); premature petition was insufficient

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: You previously filed a Notice of Intent to File Writ Petition (Notice) in this juvenile dependency case. As a result, the superior court prepared the Juvenile Writ Record which it has now filed with this court. Any writ petition in this case is due for filing with this court within 10 days from the date of this letter. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.452.) This court is aware that you attached a petition to your Notice. However, that petition does not comply with the requirements of California Rules of Court, rule 8.452, see below. The failure to comply with these requirements could result in a finding that your current petition is too inadequate to be considered on its merits. This court therefore encourages you, with or without the assistance of your trial counsel, to complete and file with this court a new petition. The petition must: Provide a summary of the significant facts, limited to matters in the record; State each point under a separate heading or subheading summarizing the point and support each point by argument and citation of authority; & Support any references to a matter in the record by a citation to the record; and explain the significance of any cited portion of the record and note any disputed aspects of the record. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.452(b).) In addition, please supply an original and four copies when filing your completed petition with this court. Enclosed, for petitioner only, is a copy of the Judicial Council approved "Petition for Extraordinary Writ" form. Further, please be advised it is this court's policy that the petitioner must serve a copy of the petition on county counsel as well as the real party in interest. Any failure to serve or delay in serving county counsel will necessarily postpone this court's consideration and disposition of the petition. Finally, in the event you do not file a new petition, this court shall attempt to review the petition which you attached with your Notice. If you need further assistance, please contact the Juvenile Dependency Team at (559) 442-2753.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: Master Index; R12/169 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C4/1152 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: Juvenile writ record filed. Due on 09/14/2021 By 5 Day(s) 2nd request to 9/14/21; No further extensions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension requested.; Notes: 2nd request to 9/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: 1st Request; Granted in Part to and Including 9/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Petitioner;At the direction of the court, I am returning your unfiled letter. Your letter is written in any language other than the English language. Any written proceedings submitted to a court of this state shall be in the English language. (See Code Civ. Proc., 185, subd. (a).) The forms made available to you in other languages are for assistance purposes only. This court does not translate foreign language written documents to English.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Premature Writ Petition received by Petitioner/Mother in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: sent to ctrrs Westfall, Meyers, Casillas, Mervin, Mills & Walker by the Superior Court on 8/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: by Petitioner/Mother in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Tulare County Superior Court - Main (Visalia); County: Tulare; Trial Court Case Number: JJV071817A; Trial Court Judge: Loza, Hugo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Tulare County Superior Court - Main (Visalia); County: Tulare; Trial Court Case Number: JJV071817C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Tulare County Superior Court - Main (Visalia); County: Tulare; Trial Court Case Number: JJV071817D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Tulare County Superior Court - Main (Visalia); County: Tulare; Trial Court Case Number: JJV071817B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tulare Co. Health and Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Tulare County is a litigant