This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/09/2023 at 08:08:31 (UTC).

GF Capital v. Stahl

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 GF Capital filed an Other lawsuit against Stahl. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wilson, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1776

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wilson, Peter

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

GF Capital

Defendants and Appellants

Lila Stahl

Stephen Whang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Thomas Taurek

Attorney at Plante Lebovic LLP

18100 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Daniel E. Park

Attorney at Park LLP

201 N Brand Blvd. Suite 200

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 04/21/2023 By 43 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Partial Remittitur: Appellant Stephen Whang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: Appellant Stephen Whang having filed a request for dismissal in this court, the appeal is DISMISSED as to this appellant only. The partial remittitur shall issue forthwith. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's application for extension of time was rejected. Question one needs to list the new default notice due date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Request for dismissal for appellant Stephen Whang only.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's stipulation was rejected. A default notice has been issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 11-22-2022 (Proceeding under rule 8.122 without RT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Aplts' motion to vacate dismissal (JOD 11/07/22)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: by appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Aplt's motion to vacate dismissal: Missing bookmarks for the motion, memorandum, introduction, legal argument, A legal standards, B good cause, conclusion & declaration.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.140(b)(1), the appeal filed September 7, 2022, is DISMISSED for appellant's failure to designate the record on appeal in a timely manner. Appellant is advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 3 0-day jurisdictional deadline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of failure to comply with notice of default. Appellant failed to file a timely designation of record on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: APLTS: Lila Stahl and Stephen Whang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01059680; Trial Court Judge: Wilson, Peter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less