This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/23/2022 at 00:17:32 (UTC).

Gerald Durham, Individually and as Successor in Interest, etc. v. Silverscreen Health Care, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 Gerald Durham, Individually and as Successor in Interest, etc filed an Other lawsuit against Silverscreen Health Care, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Apaloo, Khymberli. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8086

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Apaloo, Khymberli

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Gerald Durham

Tranail Hughes

Appellants and Defendants

Silverscreen Health Care, Inc.

Asistencia Villa Rehabilitation and Care Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Lynn Johnson

Attorney at JOHNSON MOORE

100 E Thousand Oaks Blvd Ste 229

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360-8163

Joanna Abel Hutchins

Attorney at JOHNSON MOORE

100 E Thousand Oaks Blvd Ste 229

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360-8163

Jody Cheryl Moore

Attorney at JOHNSON MOORE

100 E Thousand Oaks Blvd Ste 229

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360-8163

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen Marie Walker

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Lann G. McIntyre

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 05/23/2022 By 62 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (13 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Jan 18, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference declined.; Notes: Declined by court, prebriefing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: CCIS w/NOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: dtd Nov 24, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Nov 16, 2021; Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVSB2114063; Trial Court Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASISTENCIA VILLA REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lann G. Mcintyre

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER KATHLEEN M. ESQ.