This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2023 at 05:26:34 (UTC).

Geoulla v. California Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 Geoulla filed an Other lawsuit against California Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Moreton, Jr., Edward. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4486

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Moreton, Jr., Edward

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Daniel Geoulla

Respondent and Defendant

California Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Mahsa Farid

Attorney at B&D Law Group, APLC.

10700 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Thomas W. Shaver

Attorney at Shaver, Korff & Castronovo

16255 Ventura Blvd. Suite 850

Encino, CA 91436-2218

Tina Mamta Bhatia

Attorney at Shaver, Korff & Castronovo LLP

16255 Ventura Blvd Suite 850

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: Appellant's notice of errata re appellants reply brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Daniel Geoulla Attorney: Mahsa Farid One extension granted for a total of 61 days: 10/17/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 12/27/2022 By 61 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Daniel GeoullaAttorney: Mahsa Farid; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 61 days: 10/17/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 12/27/2022 By 61 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: California Automobile Insurance Company Attorney: Thomas W. Shaver Attorney: Tina Mamta Bhatia Two extensions granted for a total of 60 days: 08/01/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 09/07/2022 By 30 Day(s) 09/06/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 10/07/2022 By 30 Day(s) 09/07/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/07/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: California Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney: Thomas W. Shaver Attorney: Tina Mamta Bhatia; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 60 days: 08/01/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 09/07/2022 By 30 Day(s) 09/06/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 10/07/2022 By 30 Day(s) 09/07/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/07/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: Notice of errata re appellant's opening brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-8 (2160 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to this court's notice sent August 27, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The civil case information statement filed on August 25, 2021 for the appeal filed on August 5, 2021 is deficient as it does not have attached to it a copy of the signed order or judgment of dismissal. (Code Civ. Proc., 581d; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).) You must provide the Court with a conformed copy of the signed order or judgment, with a proof of service attached (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25(a)(1)-(2)), within 15 days of the date of this notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Submitted by appellant with his civil case information statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Daniel Geoulla Attorney: Mahsa Farid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Daniel GeoullaAttorney: Mahsa Farid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 8/12/2021 - designating CRC 8.122 w/RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check# 108668 for $275.00 and check# 108667 for $500.00 (DDS Legal Support Systems, Inc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 8/5/2021 by Daniel Geoulla

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BS170239; Trial Court Judge: Moreton, Jr., Edward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BHATIA TINA MAMTA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAVER THOMAS W. ESQ.