This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/12/2023 at 04:05:36 (UTC).

Georgene Fix v. Fitness International, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Georgene Fix filed an Other lawsuit against Fitness International, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarville, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8763

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McCarville, Brian

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Georgene Fix

Defendant and Appellant

Fitness International, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Kipp Kramer

Attorney at Kramer Trial Lawyers A.P.C.

1925 Century Park East, Suite 1180

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Julie Rae Trotter

Attorney at Call & Jensen, APC

610 Newport Center Drive, Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Jeffrey M David

Attorney at Call & Jensen, APC

610 Newport Center Drive, Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Partial as to applnt Georgene Fix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: as to appellant Fitness International, for failure to timely pay fees for record preparation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: dtd Sep 20, 2022 for applnt Fitness Intn'l

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Partial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: as to appellant Georgene Fix, for failure to timely pay fees for record preparation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Proposed briefing sequence must be served and filed with the clerk of this court on or before 20 days from filing of the second notice of appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Fitness International, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cross, dtd Apr 19, 2022; Fitness International, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Georgene Fix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS; lacks copy of order/judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: dtd Apr 11, 2022; Georgene Fix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by appellant Georgene Fix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Mar 30, 2022; Georgene Fix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVDS1800354; Trial Court Judge: McCarville, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fitness International, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID JEFFREY M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TROTTER JULIE RAE