This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/02/2023 at 13:05:23 (UTC).

George v. Schaffer et al.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 George filed an Other lawsuit against Schaffer. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosenbloom, Jonathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0446

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rosenbloom, Jonathan

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Appellant

Amy George

Respondents

Kerry Samuel Schaffer

Aileen Federizo

Not Yet Classified

SHB Revocable Intervivos Trust Established November 19, 2019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorneys

Phillip John Szachowicz

David Gerald Greco

Respondent Attorneys

Kerry Samuel Schaffer

Savannah B. Brutto

David M Kim

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/08/2023

DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: Pursuant to the voluntary dismissal request filed March 6, 2023, the appeal filed April 14, 2022 is dismissed. The remittitur shall issue forthwith. Edmon, P. J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: [THE COURT: Extensions of time is granted to March 31, 2023; no further extensions will be granted.]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Application for second extension of time to file Appellant's appendix and opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated April 22, 2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022

DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Change of Address for petitioner/appellant counsel RMO, LLP: 901 Bringham Ave Los Angeles, CA 90049

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Amy George Attorney: David Gerald Greco

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Amy GeorgeAttorney: David Gerald Greco

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 400162 for $775.00 (LA Depositions, Inc)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 4/14/2022 by Amy George ("U")

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STPB06256; Trial Court Judge: Rosenbloom, Jonathan

[+] Read More [-] Read Less