This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/10/2022 at 04:42:46 (UTC).

Gensler v. Board of Trustees of the South Orange County Community College District et al.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Gensler filed an Other lawsuit against Board of Trustees of the South Orange County Community College District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hunt, Derek. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1503

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hunt, Derek

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Howard Gensler

Irvine, CA 92620

Respondents and Defendants

Board of Trustees of the South Orange County Community College District

The South Orange County Community College District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Dennis J. Walsh

Attorney at Walsh & Associates, APC

16633 Ventura Blvd Ste 800

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: ***Jurisdictional order due***.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: To court.; Notes: Aplt's mtn vacate dismissal and reinstate appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: By aplt, mtn vacate dismissal and reinstate appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.140(b)(1), the appeal filed June 23, 2022, is DISMISSED for appellant's failure to deposit costs in a timely manner for preparation of the record on appeal. Appellant is advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 30-day jurisdictional deadline.Mailed copy of order to appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of failure to comply with notice of default re funds.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Copy mailed and e-mailed to appellant with confirmation of delivery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplt: Howard Gensler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2021-01177691; Trial Court Judge: Hunt, Derek

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of The South Orange County Community College District is a litigant

Latest cases where South Orange County Community College District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.