This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/11/2023 at 03:13:18 (UTC).

4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC v. 26 Malibu, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against 26 Malibu, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alarcon, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7729

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alarcon, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC

Appellants and Defendants

General Concepts Inc.

4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC

26 Malibu, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald Karl Giller

Attorney at Hennelly & Grossfeld LLP

4640 Admiralty Way Ste 850

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Kevin John Leichter

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd. 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew Ethan Hewitt

Attorney at The Leichter Firm APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd 4Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ronald Karl Giller

Attorney at Hennelly & Grossfeld LLP

4640 Admiralty Way Ste 850

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 01/27/2023 By 60 Day(s) NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 01/27/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 11/28/2022 By 63 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Stipulation for extension of time rejected for requesting 90 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Briefing sequence order filed.; Notes: The parties having failed to submit proposals for a briefing sequence within the time provided by rule 8.216(a)(1), California Rules of Court, the court orders the following: Appellant 26 Malibu, LLC shall file an opening brief and appendix within 40 days of filing of the record on appeal. Appellant 4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC shall file a combined respondent's and opening brief pursuant to rule 8.216(b)(1) within 30 days of filing of appellant's opening brief. Appellant 26 Malibu, LLC shall file a combined reply and respondent's brief pursuant to rule 8.216(b)(1) within 30 days after filing of the combined respondent's and opening brief. Appellant 4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC may file a reply brief 20 days thereafter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 21, 2022: (X) - Proceed with using Rule 8.147(a) and the record the notice of appeal that was filed Dec. 20, 2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The court has read and considered cross-appellant's motion for relief from default and to vacate dismissal and reinstate cross-appeal (X) filed May 20, 2022. Good cause appearing, the order of dismissal filed May 17, 2022, is vacated and the appeal filed January 18, 2022, is reinstated. Cross-Appellant is granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by appellant's failure to comply as required by the rules of court. Appellant must serve and file a Notice of Designating the Record on Appeal and pay any applicable fees pursuant to California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and/or 8.130 within 15 days from the date of this order. All acts (except for payment of fees) in compliance with this relief order are to be performed via the Los Angeles County Superior Court's electronic filing service provider. Payment of fees must be made at Room 111-A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, California. Self-represented parties are not required to electronically file and may comply with this order at 111 North Hill Street, Room 111-A, Los Angeles, California. Appellant shall take immediate action to cure the default and, under no circumstances, shall appellant take more than 15 days to do so. If appellant fails to cure the default in a timely manner, the Clerk of the Superior Court shall immediately notify the Court of Appeal, and the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (Dec. 20, 2021: 26 Malibu LLC. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (January 18, 2022 by 4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC. (X) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 14, 2022: (Dec. 20, 2021 appeal)(X)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing Fee of 775.00 Paid for 26 Malibu LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received *12/20/2021 Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on 12/20/2021 by 26 Malibu LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing Fee of 775.00 paid for 4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (X)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cross-Appeal filed on January 18, 2022 by 4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC (X)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: SC124734; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC591672; Trial Court Judge: Alarcon, Gregory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less