This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/16/2023 at 08:06:00 (UTC).

Gath v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Gath filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaffney, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2200

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gaffney, Donald

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Janice K. Gath

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. Donald F. Gaffney, Dept N16 700 Civic Center Drive

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

Gregory Shin

Southern California Gas Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert James Lynch

Attorney at McMahon Law Firm Inc

1250 Corona Pointe Court, Suite 407

Corona, CA 92879

Interested Party Attorneys

Robert John Stoll, Jr

Attorney at Stoll Nussbaum & Polakov

11620 Wilshire Blvd #500

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1738

Jenus Khorsandi Nourafchan

Attorney at Levy & Nourafchan LLP

9454 Wilshire Blvd #500

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate and request for immediate stay are DENIED. The parties' stipulated application for an extension of time for real party in interest to file preliminary opposition is DENIED as moot. SANCHEZ, ACTING P. J. * Before Sanchez, Acting P. J., Moore, J., and Delaney, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: stipulated application for an extension of time for real party in interest to file preliminary opposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Stipulation was returned. All parties need to be served on the proof of service not just the petitioner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Extension of time to file response to petition has been returned. Must fill out correctly. Respondent's brief was selected and that is not the proper selection for a writ petition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended exhibits in support of petition 1 volume 297 pages.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.; Notes: petitioner: Janice K. Gath.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Sent attorney an email regarding the corrections he needs to make to the petition and exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Appendix of Exhibits A thru W.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Filed by petitioner: Janice K. Gath. IMMEDIATE STAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less