This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/20/2023 at 04:16:41 (UTC).

Garza v. Lu

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 Garza filed an Other lawsuit against Lu. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Crowley, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3979

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Crowley, Daniel

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Robert Garza

Respondent and Defendant

Liberty Mutual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel M. Shapiro

Attorney at Daniel M. Shapiro, Attorney at Law

1366 E Palm St.

Altadena, CA 91001

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Nicholas Justin Boos

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale LLP

600 Montgomery Street Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate dismissal; declaration of Daniel M. Shapiro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 28, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 16, 2022: 8.122 no RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed October 6, 2022, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: clerk's notice of noncompliance dated 12/7/2022; failure to serve copy of notice of appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Robert Garza Attorney: Daniel M. Shapiro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Robert GarzaAttorney: Daniel M. Shapiro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on October 06, 2022 by Robert Garza.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV36123; Trial Court Judge: Crowley, Daniel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOS NICHOLAS JUSTIN