This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/13/2020 at 00:20:07 (UTC).

Garmestani v. Wasserman et al.

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 Garmestani filed an Other lawsuit against Wasserman. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mohr, Anthony. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4973

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mohr, Anthony

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Marjan Garmestani

Defendants and Respondents

Faramarz Zargar

Michael E Wasserman

Law Offices of Micheal E. Wasserman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Paul P. Tashnizi

Mark Schaeffer

Jonathan B. Cole

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Marjan Garmestani Pro Per For the notice of appeal filed April 7, 2020. (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Marjan GarmestaniPro Per; Notes: For the notice of appeal filed April 7, 2020. (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: March 13, 2020: Marjan Garmestani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed on April 16, 2020 (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Marjan Garmestani Pro Per (R) Notice of Appeal filed March 13, 2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Marjan GarmestaniPro Per; Notes: (R)Notice of Appeal filed March 13, 2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee Received for Notice of Appeal filed April 07, 2020 (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on April 07, 2020 by Marjan Garmestani (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed on April 07, 2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 1174 of $775.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Mark Schaeffer of Nemecek & Cole dated 3/18/2020 will be handling the appeal for respondent Michael E. Wasserman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed on March 13, 2020 by Marjan Garmestani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV35142; Trial Court Judge: Mohr, Anthony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less