This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/18/2021 at 14:25:34 (UTC).

Garmestani v. Wasserman et al.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Garmestani filed an Other lawsuit against Wasserman. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mohr, Anthony. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7428

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mohr, Anthony

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Marjan Garmestani, D.D.S.

Defendants and Respondents

Faramarz Zargar

Michael E Wasserman, Esq.

Law Offices of Michael E. Wasserman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Duane Lee Bartsch

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Paul P. Tashnizi

Jonathan B. Cole

Mark Schaeffer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: Cause to be submitted.; Notes: March 10, 2021 at 01:30 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingDescription: Calendar notice returned with proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: This case is ordered on calendar for: March 10, 2021 at 01:30 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the court may consider appeals B304973 and B307428 concurrently for purposes of oral argument and decision. Edmon, P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: Reply Brief was due 1/11/21 and not filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed joinder of:; Notes: NOTICE OF JOINDER OF RESPONDENT FARAMARZ ZARGAR IN RESPONDENT WASSERMAN'S APPEAL BRIEFFaramarz Zargar, Defendant and Respondent Paul P. Tashnizi, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Michael E Wasserman, Esq. Attorney: Jonathan B. Cole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: Entry stricken on 12/11/20. NOTICE OF JOINDER OF RESPONDENT FARAMARZ ZARGAR IN RESPONDENT' WASSERMAN'S APPEAL BRIEF reflecting case number B304973 inadvertently submitted via TrueFiling under case number B307428. Joinder resubmitted and filed under the correct case number, B304973.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Michael E Wasserman, Esq.Attorney: Jonathan B. Cole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: One Volume

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Response to Garmestani's application for extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Application for extension of time to file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant Marian Garmestani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: appellant's notice filed on 8/31/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Marjan Garmestani, D.D.S. Attorney: Duane Lee Bartsch

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card by Marjan Garmestani Marjan Garmestani, D.D.S., Plaintiff and Appellant Duane Lee Bartsch, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Marjan Garmestani, D.D.S.Attorney: Duane Lee Bartsch

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed Aug 21, 2020 by Marjan Garmestani (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV35142; Trial Court Judge: Mohr, Anthony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less