This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/26/2021 at 06:53:39 (UTC).

GARLAND v. YOUNG

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 GARLAND filed an Other lawsuit against YOUNG. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8828

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Marcus Garland

Respondents and Defendants

Titus Young

Robert Young

Teresa Young

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Albert Douglas Mastroianni

Attorney at Mastroianni Law Firm

P.O. Box 3548

Palos Verdes Peninsu, CA 90274

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Robert W. Armstrong

Attorney at Demler, Armstrong & Rowland

4500 East Pacific Coast Highway 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90804-3298

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Robert Young Attorney: Robert W. Armstrong Defendant and Respondent: Teresa Young Attorney: Robert W. Armstrong *** The Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District recommends the opinion not be published on the ground it does not meet the standards of publication. ***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B292533; Disposition: Affirmed in full with directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC691260

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTROIANNI ALBERT DOUGLAS