This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/26/2021 at 14:47:07 (UTC).

GARDENA HOSPITAL v. S.C. (SMITH)

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 GARDENA HOSPITAL filed an Other lawsuit against C SMITH. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9571

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gardena Hospital, L.P.

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Brenda Smith

Avanti Healthcare Holdings

Gardena Hospital Management, LLC

Pipeline Health System Holdings, LLC

Pipeline Health Systems, LLC

Nicholas Orzano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Barry A. Bradley

Attorney at Bradley & Gmelich LLP

700 N. Brand Boulevard, 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203

Dawn Cushman

Attorney at Bradley & Gmelich LLP,

700 N. Brand Boulevard, 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203-1202

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Stephen M. Garcia

Attorney at Garcia & Artigliere

One World Trade Center Suite 1950

Long Beach, CA 90831

Stephanie Charles

Attorney at Bonne Bridges Mueller Okeefe & Nichols

355 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1750

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1562

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied; Notes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., was absent and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Brenda Smith Attorney: Stephen M. Garcia to petitioner's July 6, 2021 stay application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay application filed (separate petition pending); Notes: Gardena Hospital, L.P., Petitioner Dawn Cushman, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Gardena Hospital, L.P. Attorney: Dawn Cushman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B313015; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV32731

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES STEPHANIE