Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/11/2021 at 04:12:24 (UTC).

GARDENA, CITY OF v. STATE WATER RESOURCES CONTROL BOARD (CITY OF WEST COVINA)

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 GARDENA, CITY OF filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against STATE WATER RESOURCES CONTROL BOARD CITY OF WEST COVINA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7537

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Interested Parties

City of Temple City

County of Los Angeles

City of Inglewood

City of Whittier

City of El Monte

Los Angeles County Flood Control District

City of Los Angeles

City of San Dimas

City of West Hollywood

City of Culver City

City of Signal Hill

City of Pasadena

City of Irwindale

City of Baldwin Park

City of Monterey Park

City of Lomita

City of Cerritos

City of Calabasas

City of LaVerne

City of Hermosa Beach

151 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Gregory Michael Murphy

Attorney at Burke Williams & Sorenen LLP

1770 Iowa Avenue, Suite 240

Riverside, CA 92507-2479

Tracy Jane Egoscue

Attorney at Egoscue Law Group

3834 Pine Avenue

Long Beach, CA 90807-3234

Lisa Marie Bond

Attorney at Richards Watson & Gershon

350 S Outh Grand Avenue, 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kimberly Hall Barlow

Attorney at Jones & Mayer

3777 North Harbor Boulevard

Fullerton, CA 92835

Christine M. Carson

Attorney at Aleshire & Wynder LLP

2361 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 475

El Segundo, CA 90245

Brad Lloyd Fuller

Attorney at City Attorneys Office

100 North Garfield Avenue, Suite N210

Pasadena, CA 91109

Deborah Anne Wordham

Attorney at Pasadena City Attorney's Ofice

100 North Garfield Avenue, Room N-210

Pasadena, CA 91101

Robert Stephen Tafoya

Attorney at Tafoya law Group, APC

316 West Second Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Christine Marie Carson

Attorney at Aleshire & Wynder LLP

2361 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 475

El Segundo, CA 90245

Aleksan Robert Giragosian

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101

Robert L. Kress

Attorney at Wallin, Kress, Reisman, & Kranitz, LLP

11355 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Other Attorneys

Araceli Almazan

Attorney at Alvarez-Glasman & Colvin

13181 Crossroads Parkway North, Suite 400

City Industry, CA 91746-3467

Susan A. Kidwell

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2411

Michael Minshen Lee

Attorney at Senior City Attorney

275 East Olive Avenue

Burbank, CA 91502

David H Mann

Attorney at Leibold McClendon & Mann, P.C.

9841 Irvine Center Drive, Suite 230

Irvine, CA 92618

Bruce A. Lindsay

Attorney at Jones & Mayer

3777 North Harbor Boulevard

Fullerton, CA 92835

Michael B. Montgomery

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2627 Mission Street, Suite 1

San Marino, CA 91108-1639

Ryan Michael Baron

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger

2855 East Guasti Road, Suite 400

Ontario, CA 91761

John J. Harris

Attorney at Casso & Sparks, LLP

13300 Crossroads Parkway North, Suite 410

City Of Industry, CA 91746

Arnold Michael Alvarez-Glasman

Attorney at Alvarez-Glasman & Colvin

13181 Crossraods Parkway North, Suite 400 West Tower

City Of Industry, CA 91746

14 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note: Mail returned (unable to forward); Notes: Order filed 4/28/2021 to Michael Montgomery, counsel for City of Maywood Deceased.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including June 7, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Joinder to Reply to Answer to Petition for Review. City of Glendora, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Christine M. Carson, Retained counsel. City of Rancho Palos Verdes, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Christine M. Carson, Retained counsel. City Signal Hill, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Christine M. Carson, Retained counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: City of Gardena Attorney: John J. Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: State Water Resources Control Board Attorney: Jennifer Kalnins Temple Defendant and Appellant: California Regional Water Quality Control Board, Los Angeles Region Attorney: Jennifer Kalnins Temple

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition requested; Notes: Dear Counsel, Appellants State Water Resources Control Board and California Regional Water Quality Control Board, Los Angeles Region are directed to file an answer to the petition for review in the above-referenced matter. The petition was served on your office on March 9, 2021. The answer shall be served upon respondent City of Gardena and filed in this court on or before 3:00 p.m. on Friday, April 2, 2021. The answer should address all issues raised in the petition for review. Respondent must file and serve a reply to the answer on or before 3:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 7, 2021. The court does not contemplate granting any requests for extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Bruce A. Lindsay, counsel for City of West Covina, City of Santa Fe Springs, City of Lakewood and City of Claremont.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for relief from default denied (case still open)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for relief from default filed; Notes: City of Lakewood, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Bruce A. Lindsay, Retained counsel City of Santa Fe Springs, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Bruce A. Lindsay, Retained counsel City of West Covina, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Bruce A. Lindsay, Retained counsel City of Claremont, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Bruce A. Lindsay, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Letter dated March 10, 2021 informing the court defendants and appellants do no intend to file an answer to petition for review as authorized by the California Rules of Court, rule 8.500(a)(2), unless requested to do so. State Water Resources Control Board, Defendant and Appellant Jennifer Kalnins Temple, AG staff California Regional Water Quality Control Board, Los Angeles Region, Defendant and Appellant Jennifer Kalnins Temple, AG staff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Supplemental Proof of Service. City of Glendora, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Christine M. Carson, Retained counsel City of Rancho Palos Verdes, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Christine M. Carson, Retained counsel City of Signal Hill, Real Party in Interest and Respondent Christine M. Carson, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Supplemental Proof of Service City of Gardena, Plaintiff and Respondent John J. Harris, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Joinder to petition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest and Respondent: City of Glendora Attorney: Christine M. Carson Real Party in Interest and Respondent: City of Rancho Palos Verdes Attorney: Christine M. Carson Real Party in Interest and Respondent: City of Signal Hill Attorney: Christine M. Carson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: City of Gardena Attorney: John J. Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G058540; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Central; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2016-00833722

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LA VERNE is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF IRWINDALE is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SAN DIMAS is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LOMITA is a litigant