This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/20/2022 at 01:39:42 (UTC).

Garcia v. 2nd Marketing LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Garcia filed an Other lawsuit against 2nd Marketing LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Crowley, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1421

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Crowley, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Daniel Garcia

Appellant and Defendant

2nd Marketing LLC

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

FedEx Corporation

2nd Marketing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Parag L. Amin

Attorney at Law Office of Parag L. Amin, P.C.

5901 W Century Blvd, Ste 1518

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Tye Gordon Trostad

Attorney at Tye G. Trostad

751 S Weir Canyon Rd Ste 157

Anaheim, CA 92808-1800

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Grant request to continue oral argument.; Notes: Pursuant to request from counsel for appellant 2ND Marketing LLC. The clerk is directed to place the matter on the August 2022 oral argument calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request to continue oral arg - to court.; Notes: Appellant's request to continue oral argument to August 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: June 7, 2022 at 9am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Daniel Garcia Attorney: Parag L. Amin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Daniel GarciaAttorney: Parag L. Amin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Daniel Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred.; Notes: Appellant's motion requesting judicial notice in support of its opening brief is deferred to panel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: re appellant's opening brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: 2nd Marketing LLC Attorney: Tye Gordon Trostad Two extensions granted for a total of 84 days: 11/01/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 12/03/2021 By 30 Day(s) 11/08/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 12/03/2021 By 30 Day(s) 12/09/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 02/14/2022 By 54 Day(s) 12/16/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/14/2022 By 54 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service of appellant's application for extension of time to file brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (106 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: 2nd Marketing LLC Attorney: Tye Gordon Trostad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: 2nd Marketing LLCAttorney: Tye Gordon Trostad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated March 10, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Law Offices of Tye G. Trostad.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Mar 2, 2021 by 2nd Marketing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV24329; Trial Court Judge: Crowley, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIN PARAG L.