Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/08/2021 at 01:50:03 (UTC).

Garcia et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Garcia filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mackey, Malcolm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0644

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 1

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mackey, Malcolm

 

Party Details

Petitioners

County of Los Angeles

Elizabeth Garcia

Sharon Harada

Reaver Bingham

Respondents

Hon. Malcolm H. Mackey

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Mark Ward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Melinda Lee Cantrall

Attorney at Hurrell Cantrall LLP

300 S. Grand Avenue Ste 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Thomas Charles Hurrell

Attorney at Hurrell & Cantrall, LLP

One California Plaza 300 South Grand Avenue, 13Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Chijioke O. Ikonte

Attorney at Akudinobi & Ikonte

3435 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1520

Los Angeles, CA 90010-1915

Emmanuel Chukwuemek Akudinobi

Attorney at Akudinobi & Ikonte

3435 Wilshire Blvd. Ste 1520

Los Angeles, CA 90010-1915

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: ERRATA REGARDING PETITIONERS' REPLY TO REAL PARTY IN INTEREST MARK WARD'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: PETITIONERS' REPLY TO REAL PARTY IN INTEREST MARK WARD'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND/OR PROHIBITION OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: REAL PARTY IN INTEREST'S APPENDIX IN LIEU OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: Real Party in Interest Mark Ward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: All proceedings and discovery in Los Angeles Superior Court case No. BC619972, entitled Mark Ward v. County of Los Angeles, are hereby stayed pending resolution of the above petition or further order of this Court. Opposition to the petition for writ of mandate by real party in interest shall be served and filed by personal delivery or via the court's e-filing service provider (TrueFiling) by 10:00 a.m., on March 26, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE-IMMEDIATE STAY REQUESTED OF JANUARY 29, 2021 ORDER AND RELATED PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKUDINOBI EMMANUEL CHUKWUEMEK