This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/24/2023 at 22:02:07 (UTC).

Garcia-Brower v. Superior Court of California, City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 Garcia-Brower filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of California, City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schulman, Ethan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7201

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Schulman, Ethan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lilia Garcia-Brower

Appellant and Defendant

The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

Portier, LLC

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Lyft, Inc.

The People of the State of California

Uladzimir Tabola

Jonathan Gregg

Division of Labor Standards Enforcement

Brandon Olson

Erik Adolph

Million Seifu

Rasier, LLC

Rasier-CA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Interested Party Attorneys

David Maxim Balter

Miles Eric Locker

Alec L. Segarich

M. Colleen Ryan

Blaine H. Evanson

Theodore Joseph Boutrous

Jaime B. Laurent

Sophia Behnia Collins

Milagros R. Villalobos Navas

Emily Rose Sauer

Alexander Norman Harris

Heather Lynn Richardson

Theane Evangelis

Andrew M. Spurchise

Anthony G. Ly

Rohit Kumar Singla

Jeffrey Ying-Ting Wu

Justin Paul Raphael

Rachael Elizabeth Meny

R. James Slaughter

40 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits A - S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CJC21005179; Trial Court Judge: Schulman, Ethan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less