This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/27/2023 at 02:26:37 (UTC).

Garaventa v. Binswanger

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Garaventa filed an Other lawsuit against Binswanger. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Baskin, Barry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5750

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Baskin, Barry

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Joseph Garaventa

Respondent and Defendant

Walter Binswanger, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Wallace C. Doolittle

Attorney at Law Office of Wallace C. Doolittle

1260 B Street, Suite 220

Hayward, CA 94541

James Patrick Downs

Attorney at Law Offices of Wallace C. Doolittle

1260 "B" Street - Suite 220

Hayward, CA 94541

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Batya Floryn Smernoff

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street, 26Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

Patrick T. Burns

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market St Fl 26

San Francisco, CA 94105-5401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: BY THE COURT: Appellant's motion to augment the record on appeal, filed on March 6, 2023, is granted. The record on appeal is deemed augmented to include a copy of the documents described in, and attached to, the exhibits in support of the motion to augment. The motion to augment and the exhibits are incorporated by reference. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.155(a)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/05/2023 By 61 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits in Support of Motion to Augment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: from attorney James Downs for appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: vol. 3 of 3, pgs. 805-1201

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: vol. 2 of 3, pgs. 396-804

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: vol. 1 of 3, pgs. 1-395

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Joseph Garaventa Attorney: James Patrick Downs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/05/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Walter Binswanger, IIIAttorney: Batya Floryn Smernoff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: motion to augment; missing descriptive electronic bookmarks (CRC 8.74(a)(3))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 08/05/2022. Respondent has elected to proceed per CRC 8.124.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Joseph Garaventa Attorney: Wallace C. Doolittle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Joseph GaraventaAttorney: Wallace C. Doolittle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by Law Offices of Wallace C. Doolittle, attorneys for appellant Garaventa (credit card payment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 07/27/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Joseph Garaventa appealing judgment from 07/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: C1801289; Trial Court Judge: Baskin, Barry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less