This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/19/2023 at 20:00:54 (UTC).

Galleguillos v. Flores

Case Summary

On 02/28/2023 Galleguillos filed an Other lawsuit against Flores. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaller, Frederick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6994

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Shaller, Frederick

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Maria Isabel Galleguillos

Defendant and Appellant

Lynn Marlene Flores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Kevin Joy

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Eric B. Kunkel

Tomas Joseph Ross

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2023

DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: Pursuant to voluntary request for dismissal, filed September 26, 2023, the appeal filed February 28, 2023 is dismissed. Remittitur to issue forthwith.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketDescription: Settled by settlement conference.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketDescription: Settlement conference held.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketDescription: Settlement conference rescheduled to:; Notes: August 1, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. (Derrick)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
05/31/2023

DocketDescription: Settlement conference rescheduled to:; Notes: June 19, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. (Derrick)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketDescription: Settlement conference scheduled for:; Notes: May 31, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. (Derrick)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion for leave to amend designation of record on appeal; declaration of Eric B. Kunkel; [proposed] order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketDescription: Settlement conference requested by:; Notes: appellant.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Lynn Marlene Flores Attorney: Tomas Joseph Ross

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Lynn Marlene FloresAttorney: Tomas Joseph Ross

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: notice filed 3/10/2023 SCLA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #234778 for $775 from lasc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on February 28, 2023 by Lynn Marlene Flores.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV44487; Trial Court Judge: Shaller, Frederick

[+] Read More [-] Read Less