This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/03/2022 at 01:55:15 (UTC).

Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. v. Gaines

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Gaines. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Doyle, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4160

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Doyle, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Milton Howard Gaines

Appellant and Defendant

Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

W. Keith Wyatt

Attorney at Ivie, McNeill & Wyatt

444 S. Flower Street 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Steven Ray Garcia

Attorney at Garcia Legal, A Professional Corporation

225 South Lake Avenue Suite 1400

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Attorney: Steven Ray Garcia Three extensions granted for a total of 168 days: 12/30/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 02/28/2022 By 56 Day(s) 12/30/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/28/2022 By 56 Day(s) 03/03/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 05/20/2022 By 81 Day(s) 05/19/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 06/20/2022 By 31 Day(s) 05/23/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 06/20/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 07/20/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Milton Howard GainesAttorney: W. Keith Wyatt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.Attorney: Steven Ray Garcia; Notes: Three extensions granted for a total of 168 days: 12/30/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 02/28/2022 By 56 Day(s) 12/30/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/28/2022 By 56 Day(s) 03/03/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 05/20/2022 By 81 Day(s) 05/19/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 06/20/2022 By 31 Day(s) 05/23/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 06/20/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Grimes, Acting P.J. - (Briefing Sequence Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Proposed briefing sequence for all briefs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Volume 4 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Volume 3 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Volume 2 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Volume 1 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Attorney: Steven Ray Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.Attorney: Steven Ray Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check# D4018646 for $775.00 (InfoTrack US, Inc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 7/23/2021 by Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC361768; Trial Court Judge: Doyle, John

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WYATT WILLIAM KEITH