This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/02/2022 at 00:57:03 (UTC).

Furie v. Furie

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Furie filed an Other lawsuit against Furie. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Byrd, Christine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5405

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Byrd, Christine

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Respondent

Kelly Furie

Appellant

Russell Furie

Canyon Country, CA 91351

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorney

Lisa Francine Rosenthal

Attorney at The Law Offices of Rosenthal & Associates

6016 Fallbrook Ave. Suite 101

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: AOB + 30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Suspend briefing.; Notes: Appellant: Russell Furie Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Russell Furie informs SCLA on May 9, 2022 that an item is missing from the record. (December 30, 2015 RT by Anna Diaz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: CT + RT(filed September 14, 2021 in Superior Court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketBrief: Suspend briefing.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Russell FuriePro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 07/15/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 07/15/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: R. Furie stating that the RT volume is missing the December 30, 2015 transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-8 (2103 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to this court's notice sent November 10, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The civil case information statement filed on October 5, 2021 for the appeal filed on August 7, 2021 is deficient as it does not have attached to it a copy of the written order after hearing. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).) You must provide the Court with a conformed copy of the written order, with a proof of service attached (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25(a)(1)-(2)), within 15 days of the date of this notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Russell Furie Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: NO Signed order or Judgment being appealed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Russell FuriePro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Russell FuriePro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: money order #R209901942063 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Sep 7, 2021 by Russell Furie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: PD048281; Trial Court Judge: Byrd, Christine

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F