This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/21/2022 at 17:00:41 (UTC).

Friends of Oceano Dunes, Inc. v. The Superior Court of San Luis Obispo County

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Friends of Oceano Dunes, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Luis Obispo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coates, Tana. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9692

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Coates, Tana

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Friends of Oceano Dunes, Inc.

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Luis Obispo County

Interested Parties

California Coastal Commission

California Department of Parks and Recreation

San Luis Obispo County Air Pollution Control District

Board of Directors of the San Luis Obispo County Air Pollution Control District

San Luis Obispo County Air Pollution Control District Hearing Board

County of San Luis Obispo

City of Grover Beach

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thomas Denney Roth

Interested Party Attorneys

Mitchell Elliott Rishe

Jacqueline Kieu Vu

Tara Elizabeth Lynch Todd

Michelle Landis Gearhart

Office of the County Counsel

Jon Michael Ansolabehere

Molly Elizabeth Thurmond

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for a writ of mandate or, alternatively, prohibition and request for an immediate stay are denied. (10)(GYP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for a writ of mandate or, alternatively, prohibition and request for an immediate stay are denied. (10)(GYP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF INITIAL OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY PETITION, VOL 1 of 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: INITIAL OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY PETITION,ADAMSKI MOROSKI MADDEN CUMBERLAND & GREEN, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: PRELIMINARY OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND IMMEDIATE STAY OF RULING DENYING PETITIONER?S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DAG J. Vu

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition; Volume 3 (884-1281)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition; Volume 2 (452-883)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition; Volume 1 (1-451)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate/Prohibition; IMMEDIATE STAY REQUESTED OF THE SUPERIOR COURT'S APRIL 11, 2022 RULING DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); County: San Luis Obispo; Trial Court Case Number: 22CV-0024; Trial Court Judge: Coates, Tana

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less