This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/30/2023 at 08:05:13 (UTC).

Friends of Oceano Dunes Inc. v. California Coastal Commission **CEQA**

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Friends of Oceano Dunes Inc filed an Other lawsuit against California Coastal Commission CEQA. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coates, Tana. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0491

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Coates, Tana

 

Party Details

Respondents and Petitioners

Friends of Oceano Dunes Inc.

EcoLogic Partners, Inc.

Specialty Equiptment Market Association

California Coastal Commission

California Department of Parks & Recreation

Appellants

Northern Chumash Tribal Council

Center for Biological Diversity

Oceano Beach Community Association

Interested Party

County of San Luis Obispo Board of Supervisors

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

Thomas Denney Roth

David Patrick Hubbard

Kendall Frances Teal

Deborah Sivas

Molly D. Melius

Office of the Attorney General

William J. White

John J. Flynn

Appellant Attorneys

Daniel S. Jacobs

Michael Jay Robinson-Dorn

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the County Counsel

Jon Michael Ansolabehere

 

Court Documents

B320491

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: SERVICE COPY of letter dated 6-30-2023 in support of request for depublication by attorney J. Markovitz and A. Salceda / ACLU foundation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: SERVICE COPY of opposition to request for depublication by attorney T. Roth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: SERVICE COPY of request for depublication by attorney M. Robinson-Dorn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for rehearing denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: Attorney Dorn on behalf of appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final AFF/15 pages/BGY; Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Baltodano, Hernaldo J.; Participants: Gilbert, Arthur (Concur) Yegan, Kenneth R. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Published) AFF/15 pages/BGYThe trial court's order denying Appellants' motion for leave to intervene, entered March 21, 2022, is affirmed. Respondents shall recover their costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Thursday April 13, 2023 at 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Attorney T. Roth on behalf of respondent FOD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration of Jabari Brown in Support of Appellants' Motion for Calendar Preference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion for expedited briefing/calendar preference by attorney D. Jacobs on behalf of appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Northern Chumash Tribal Council Attorney: Daniel S. Jacobs Appellant: Center for Biological Diversity Attorney: Daniel S. Jacobs Appellant: Oceano Beach Community Association Attorney: Daniel S. Jacobs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Northern Chumash Tribal CouncilAttorney: Daniel S. Jacobs Appellant: Center for Biological DiversityAttorney: Daniel S. Jacobs Appellant: Oceano Beach Community AssociationAttorney: Daniel S. Jacobs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 6-3-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Dated 5-24-22; CT and RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 5-19-2022 by Northern Chumash Tribal Council et al. challenging 3-21-2022 ruling on motion to intervene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); County: San Luis Obispo; Trial Court Case Number: 21CV-0214; Trial Court Judge: Coates, Tana

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less