This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/29/2022 at 02:15:28 (UTC).

Friedman v. Ryngler

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Friedman filed an Other lawsuit against Ryngler. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Watkins, Shirley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6408

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Watkins, Shirley

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Roger Friedman

Abraham Ryngler

Defendant and Appellant

Abraham Ryngler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A.G.. Nangano

Attorney at Nangano & Associates

133 North Altadena Drive Suite 403

Pasadena, CA 91107

Appellant, Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Michael A.G.. Nangano

Attorney at Nangano & Associates

133 North Altadena Drive Suite 403

Pasadena, CA 91107

Michael D. Kwasigroch

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Kwasigroch

1975 Royal Ave #4

Simi Valley, CA 93065

Appellant, Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Michael D. Kwasigroch

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Kwasigroch

1975 Royal Ave #4

Simi Valley, CA 93065

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: (X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (Nov. 24, 2021: Abraham Ryngler (X) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (Cross-Appeal filed 11/24/2021 Abraham Ryngler) ("X")Civil filing fee paid by Michael Kwasigroch.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: (Cross-Appeal filed 11/24/2021 by Abraham Ryngler) ("X")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Cross-Appeal filed 11/24/2021 by Abraham Ryngler ("X")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Roger Friedman Attorney: Michael A.G.. Nangano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Roger FriedmanAttorney: Michael A.G.. Nangano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on December 21, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (Nov. 4, 2021: Roger Friedman ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Nov. 4, 2021: Roger Friedman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: LC097750; Trial Court Judge: Watkins, Shirley

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kwasigroch, Michael D.