This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/29/2023 at 18:01:59 (UTC).

Fresno Co. Dept. of Social Services v. C.Q.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2023 Fresno Co Dept of Social Services filed an Other lawsuit against C Q. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dolas, Mary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5757

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dolas, Mary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Fresno Co. Dept. of Social Services

Defendant and Appellant

C. Q.

Not Yet Classified

. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Office of the County Counsel

Carlie MacKenzie Flaugher

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

 

Court Documents

F085757

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

12/21/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 14CEJ300276-11; Trial Court Judge: Dolas, Mary

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DispositionDescription: Dismissed by opinion; Disposition Type: Final The appeal is dismissed; Hill, Levy, Meehan; 6 pages; Publication Status: By the Court - Unpublished; Participants: Hill, Brad R. (Concur) Meehan, Kathleen A. (Concur) Levy, Herbert I. (Concur)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (By the Court - Unpublished) The appeal is dismissed; Hill, Levy, Meehan; 6 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDescription: Submission order filed.; Notes: The above entitled cause is submitted for decision.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: C. Q. Pro Per in re Phoenix H.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: C. Q.Pro Per; Notes: in re Phoenix H.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant counsel has filed a brief setting out the applicable facts and the law as well as informing this court that there are no arguable issues to pursue in this case. Under these circumstances, this appeal may be dismissed as abandoned unless appellant can make a good cause showing that an arguable issue of reversible error does exist. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835.) Appellant shall have until May 11, 2023, within which to file with this court a letter setting forth a good cause showing that an arguable legal issue does, in fact, exist. If no such letter is filed within the time specified in this order, the appeal shall be dismissed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: C. Q. Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: C. Q.Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: AOB due w/n 30 days - Record on Appeal was filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: 3V/29 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 1V/268 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: by County Counsel re Additional Email Address for Electronic Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023

DocketDescription: Filed order appointing counsel (C.C.A.P. review).; Notes: Attorney Amy Tobin Appointed obo Appellant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Sent to Ctrrs Elfstrom, Lentz, and Alison on 2/15/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: J366; Appellant/Father Appeals 12/21/23 Termination of Parental Rights. Copy sent to CCAP.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less