This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/08/2020 at 01:44:44 (UTC).

Fresno Building Healthy Communities v. City of Fresno

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Fresno Building Healthy Communities filed an Other lawsuit against City of Fresno. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0265

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Fresno Building Healthy Communities

Defendants and Respondents

City of Fresno

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Respondent and Intervenor

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Deborah Barthel Caplan

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Travis Ray Stokes

Kristi Marie Costa

Timothy A. Bittle

Respondent and Intervenor Attorney

Timothy A. Bittle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/05/2020

HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: ***The due date for filing Appellant's Opening Brief was changed from April 6, 2020 to May 6, 2020, per the Emergency Order of March 23, 2020******The due date for filing Appellant's Opening Brief was changed (AGAIN) from May 6, 2020 to June 5, 2020, per the Renewed Emergency Order of April 20, 2020**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2020

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 04/06/2020 By 28 Day(s) 1st Stipulation/Request

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: All counsel re AOB due in 40 days.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing and Receipt for Record on Appeal filed 1/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 1V/177 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2020

DocketDescription: Filed change of firm name.; Notes: Effective January 1, 2020, Olson Hagel & Fishburn, LLP changed its name to Olson Remcho, LLP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Deposit for CTX by Atty Caplan filed 12/30/19.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2020

DocketDescription: Rec'd co. notice to appellant re: estimate.; Notes: 12/20/19; for CTX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2020

DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 11/27/19; for CTX only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
11/19/2019

DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Bittle obo Respondent Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2019

DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: Respondent City of Fresno

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2019

DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Deputy City Atty Stokes obo Respondent City of Fresno

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2019

DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Caplan Fresno Building Healthy Communities

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2019

DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant Fresno Building Healthy Communities' Mediation Questionnaire. Document must include an attached copy of the verdict, order, or judgment appealed from.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 obo Applt Fresno Building Healthy Communities via Credit Card

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2019

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2019

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Atty Caplan Fresno Building Healthy Communities

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2019

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Caplan obo Applt Fresno Building Healthy Communities appeals from the Judgment filed 9/30/19 in favor of Intervenor Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2019

DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Clovis; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 19CECG00432; Trial Court Judge: Gaab, Kimberly

[+] Read More [-] Read Less