This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/27/2023 at 04:00:56 (UTC).

Fresno Building Healthy Communities v. City of Fresno

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Fresno Building Healthy Communities filed an Other lawsuit against City of Fresno. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4666

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Fresno Building Healthy Communities

Defendants and Respondents

City of Fresno

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Intervenor and Respondent

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Deborah Barthel Caplan

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Travis Ray Stokes

Timothy A. Bittle

Respondent and Intervenor Attorney

Timothy A. Bittle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: F084662; All Future Entries in that Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 2nd request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: 1st

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: aao due in 40 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: R1, 21 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Sent to ctrr Colby on 11/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: register of actions mailed to parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 8/22/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Counsel and Fresno County Superior Court: The Court has determined that the above entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2 (Mediation in Civil Appeals), the suspension of the operation of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and 8.216 requiring designation of the record on appeal, payment of the estimated costs of preparation of the record on appeal, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule is terminated as of this date. You are directed to comply immediately with the applicable California Rules of Court as if the notice of appeal was filed as of the date of this letter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Caplan obo Applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Stokes obo respondent City of Fresno

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Caplan obo applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: atty Caplan obo applt, check # 14311 in the amount of $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: The copy of your notice of appeal filed in the superior court was not accompanied by the statutory filing fee of $775, as required by rule 8.100(b)(1) of the California Rules of Court. Your appeal may be dismissed within 15 days of this notice unless you either transmit the filing fee or show good cause why the payment of said fee should be excused.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 7/21/22; Atty Caplan obo Applt; 5/24/22 order after judgment; denial motion for attorney fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 19CECG00432; Trial Court Judge: Gaab, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less