This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/12/2022 at 21:47:06 (UTC).

FREITAS v. CLEAR RECON CORP

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 FREITAS filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CLEAR RECON CORP. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2653

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

John B. Freitas

Newark, CA 94560

Respondents and Defendants

Clear Recon Corp

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Casper John Rankin

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

4375 Jutland Drive, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92117

Fred T. Winters

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

4375 Jutland Drive, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92117

Jared Daniel Bissell

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

11682 El Camino Real, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130-2092

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: petition for review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: John B. Freitas Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: A160762; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: HG18908688

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANKIN, CASPER J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BISSELL JARED D.