This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/23/2023 at 23:03:10 (UTC).

Franchise Tax Board v. The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Franchise Tax Board filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ulmer, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6954

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ulmer, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Franchise Tax Board

Respondent

The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

American Catalog Mailers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Lisa W Chao

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

300 S Spring St., Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1230

Laura Elise Robbins

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S Spring St Ste 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1256

Tamar Pachter

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1230

Interested Party Attorneys

David Asher Swetnam-Burland

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

Po Box 3070 184 Main St

Lewiston, ME 4243-3070

Richard Pachter

Attorney at Law Offices of Richard Pachter

400 Capitol Mall Suite 1750 Telesis Tower

Sacramento, CA 95814

George S Isaacson

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

184 Main St. Po Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243-3070

Nathaniel A. Bessey

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

P. O. Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243

Martin I. Eisentein

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

P. O. Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate/prohibition and accompanying stay request are denied. * Before Jackson, P.J., Burns, J., and Wiseman, J. (Retired Associate Justice of the Court of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate/prohibition and accompanying stay request are denied. * Before Jackson, P.J., Burns, J., and Wiseman, J. (Retired Associate Justice of the Court of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice granted; Notes: Pursuant to 1/30/23 order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Martin Eisenstein in support of pro hac vice application

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Nathaniel Bessey, in support of pro hac vice application

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: George Isaacson, in support of pro hac vice application

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Amended proof of service (correcting mailing address for Richard Pachter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: of corrected petition and exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: corrected appendix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: corrected petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: opposition to stay request forthcoming

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: Government Agency

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration of attorney Laura A. Robbins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Chronological and alphabetical exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition, or Other Appropriate Relief Immediate Stay Requested - Trial Set for October 2, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC22601363; Trial Court Judge: Ulmer, Jr., Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less