This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/10/2021 at 01:55:33 (UTC).

F.P. v. The Superior Court; DPSS

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 F P filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court DPSS. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, Cheryl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7774

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Murphy, Cheryl

 

Party Details

Petitioner

F. P.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Not Yet Classified

F. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brent L. Valdez

Attorney at Juvenile Defense Panel

9991 County Farm Road

Riverside, CA 92503

Interested Party Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Sarah Catherine Schuler

9991-A County Farm Rd

Riverside, CA 92503-3506

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingDescription: Juvenile writ petition filed.; Notes: *****8.452*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-3. (698 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1. (21 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute order dtd Sep 15, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Sep 22, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: dtd Sep 22, 2021; F.P. (mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIJ2000196; Trial Court Judge: Murphy, Cheryl

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Catherine Schuler