***4084
10/11/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Other
Statewide, California
Meiers, Barbara
Ryan Fox
City of Los Angeles
Nathan H. Soleimani
Attorney at Gould & Jefferson LLP
8484 Wilshire Blvd Ste 235
Beverly Hills, CA 90211
Herb Fox
Attorney at Law Office of Herb Fox
1114 State St. Suite 200
Santa Barbara, CA 93101
Christopher C. Cianci
Attorney at Lagasse Branch Bell + Kinkead, LLP
626 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1000
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Court documents are not available for this case.
HearingDescription: Request for dismissal filed.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: filed 1/30/2023 SCLA
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 19, 2023
[-] Read LessHearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.; Notes: filed by appellant - a request for dismissal shall be filed within 45 days.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ryan Fox Attorney: Nathan H. Soleimani
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ryan FoxAttorney: Nathan H. Soleimani
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Civil case information statement filed. Due on 01/13/2023 By 4 Day(s) The time to file a complete case information statement is extended to January 13, 2023.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Herb Fox associates in as counsel for appellant
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: request for extension of time to file a case information statement to 1/13/2023 filed by appellant
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Civil case information statement filed. Due on 01/09/2023 By 61 Day(s)
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Civil case information statement filed. Requested for 01/09/2023 By 61 Day(s) Appellant's request for extension of time to file civil case information statement and designation of record to Jan 9, 2023.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on October 11, 2022 by Ryan Fox.
[-] Read LessDocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV42345; Trial Court Judge: Meiers, Barbara
[-] Read Less