This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/15/2023 at 05:52:05 (UTC).

FORRESTER v. AIRBORNE SYSTEMS NORTH AMERICA OF CA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 FORRESTER filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against AIRBORNE SYSTEMS NORTH AMERICA OF CA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8092

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Humphrey V. Forrester

Respondents and Defendants

Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.

Millie Nystual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Sabrina L. Shadi

Amy E. Beverlin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: petition for review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Mr. Forrester: The court has granted your application for relief from default to file the untimely petition for review and the petition was filed on January 13, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Humphrey V. Forrester Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed with permission; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Humphrey V. Forrester Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application for relief from default filed; Notes: Humphrey V. Forrester, Plaintiff and Appellant Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received untimely petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Humphrey V. Forrester Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G060465; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01006085

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less