This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/26/2023 at 06:20:10 (UTC).

FOLEY v. AIRTOUCH CELLULAR

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 FOLEY filed an Other lawsuit against AIRTOUCH CELLULAR. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4134

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

James P. Foley

Lou Ann Foley

Defendant and Appellant

Airtouch Cellular, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Philip Cook

Center for Consumer Law & Economic Justice

Consumer Federation of California

Housing and Economic Rights Advocates

National Consumer Law Center

Public Law Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

David A. Cordier

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Valeria Granata

Brian Otis Felder

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Eliza J. Duggan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/22/2022

DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022

DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Center for Consumer Law & Economic Justice Attorney: Eliza J. Duggan Pub/Depublication Requestor: Consumer Federation of California Pub/Depublication Requestor: Housing and Economic Rights Advocates Pub/Depublication Requestor: National Consumer Law Center Pub/Depublication Requestor: Public Law Center

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B312404; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV44376

[+] Read More [-] Read Less