This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/28/2021 at 08:30:43 (UTC).

FODEN v. RAICEVIC (LUX)

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 FODEN filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against RAICEVIC LUX. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6830

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

James E. Foden

Los Alamitos, CA 90720

Appellants and Defendants

Vanessa Raicevic

Margaret C. Lux

Respondents and Defendants

Margaret C. Lux

James E. Foden

Los Alamitos, CA 90720

Others

Trinity Broadcasting Network

Sharon Maas

Madison, WI 53704

Randall Maas

Peak, ID 93545

Valerie F. Horn

W. Todd Stevenson

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-3223

Reginald Maas

Newberg, OR 97132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Nigel J. Burns

Attorney at Law Offices of Nigel Burns

800 W. First Street, Suite 401-12

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Nicholas Charles Stahl

Attorney at Law Office of Nigel Burns

800 W 1St Street. Suite 401-12

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Christopher John Heck

Attorney at Wolf Rifkin Shapiro Shulman & Rabkin LLP

11400 West Olympic Boulevard, 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1422

Max Noah Wellman

Attorney at Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin LLP

11400 W Olympic Boulevard, Floor 9

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1582

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Christopher John Heck

Attorney at Wolf Rifkin Shapiro Shulman & Rabkin LLP

11400 West Olympic Boulevard, 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1422

Max Noah Wellman

Attorney at Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin LLP

11400 W Olympic Boulevard, Floor 9

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1582

Other Attorneys

Steven Jeffry Horn

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven J. Horn

15760 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1520

Encino, CA 91436-3095

W. Todd Stevenson

Attorney at Stevenson Law Office

15250 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1102

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-3223

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including April 23, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Vanessa Raicevic Attorney: Nigel J. Burns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B300918; Disposition: Dismissed by opinion; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 17STPB07874

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEVENSON W. TODD ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORN STEVEN J.