This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/25/2022 at 05:03:50 (UTC).

Flynn v. Arteaga et al.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Flynn filed an Other lawsuit against Arteaga. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Landin, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1809

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Landin, Dennis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Veda Rochelle Flynn

Defendants and Appellants

Brallan Vasques Arteaga

Jose Espinosa

Luis Espinoza Trucking, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Michael Jacob Libman

Attorney at Law Of Michael J. Libman

18321 Ventura Blvd Suite 700

Tarzana, CA 91356

Zhanna Sanamyan

Attorney at Law Office of Michael J. Libman, APC

18321 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 700

Tarzana, CA 91356

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Edye Ann Hill

Attorney at Ford, Walker, Haggerty & Behar LLP

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Brallan Vasques Arteaga Attorney: Edye Ann Hill Defendant and Appellant: Jose Espinosa Attorney: Edye Ann Hill Defendant and Appellant: Luis Espinoza Trucking, LLC Attorney: Edye Ann Hill

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Brallan Vasques ArteagaAttorney: Edye Ann Hill Defendant and Appellant: Jose EspinosaAttorney: Edye Ann Hill Defendant and Appellant: Luis Espinoza Trucking, LLCAttorney: Edye Ann Hill

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated June 14, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee receive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on June 13, 2022 by Brallan Vasques Arteaga et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC709096; Trial Court Judge: Landin, Dennis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILL EDYE ANN