This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/26/2023 at 05:10:15 (UTC).

FLORES v. CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (PEOPLE)

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 FLORES filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE PEOPLE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7648

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Joe Robles Flores

Defendant and Respondent

California Department of Justice

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Jake Pillard

Defendant, Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Attorney General - Sacramento Office

Anthony P. O'Brien

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/12/2023

DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: One file jacket

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: letter dated December 20, 2022 from respondent - California Department of Justice informing the Court that it does not intend to file an answer to petition for review unless on is requested. California Department of Justice, Defendant and Respondent Anthony P. O'Brien, AG staff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022

DocketDescription: Received additional record; Notes: one file jacket

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2022

DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2022

DocketDescription: Record requested

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Joe Robles Flores Attorney: Jake Pillard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C095611; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CR20076479AP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less